Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frank Dopper (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1971-10-20 | ||||
Matthias Mink (until 2019-03-20) | 1967-07-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frederic Lohe (until 2019-01-14) | 1988-08-12 | |||
19 | Tim Paterok (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-08-05 | |||
21 | Matay Birol (from 2019-01-23) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-16 | |||
27 | Julian Bibleka (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-04 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Timo Kunert (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-03-12 | |||
3 | Daniel Reith (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-02-10 | |||
4 | Nico Herzig (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-12-10 | |||
5 | Sasa Strujic (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-12-08 | |||
6 | Wilfried Sarr (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-06-16 | |||
13 | Daniel Reith (until 2018-12-31) | 1988-02-10 | |||
20 | Florian Heister (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-02 | |||
22 | Tim Welker (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-09-08 | |||
30 | Tom Zundorf (until 2019-01-10) | 1997-06-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tim Muller (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-08-04 | ||||
7 | Dennis Wegner (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-01-10 | |||
8 | Dino Bisanovic (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-03-13 | |||
11 | Nikola Trkulja (until 2020-01-01) | 1991-06-22 | |||
14 | Arnold Budimbu (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-20 | |||
15 | David Al-Azzawe (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-06-05 | |||
17 | Sascha Marquet (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-11-07 | |||
21 | Gani Sevim (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-07-12 | |||
23 | Moritz Hannappel (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-25 | |||
24 | Junior Ebot-Etchi (from 2019-01-25) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-02 | |||
33 | Maurice Muller (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-08-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Moritz Gottel (until 2020-12-31) | 1993-02-12 | |||
10 | Fatih Candan (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-12-30 | |||
13 | Christopher Kramer (from 2019-01-11) (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-10-16 | |||
18 | Shqipon Bektasi (until 2019-01-08) | 1990-09-14 | |||
24 | Benedikt Koep (until 2019-01-24) | 1987-10-01 | |||
32 | Marcel Reichwein (from 2019-01-29) (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-02-21 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tom Zundorf (from 2019-01-10) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |