Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fatih Cift (until 2019-10-13) | 1981-10-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Marcel Behr (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-03-02 | ||||
1 | Luca Beck (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-02-22 | |||
33 | Tobias Oost (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-05-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Christian Meinert (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-12-22 | |||
4 | Marvin Weber (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-02-08 | |||
5 | Thilo Krämer (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-12-23 | |||
20 | Dominik Schmidt (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-09-19 | |||
22 | Giuliano Masala (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-07-30 | |||
25 | Jan Henrich (until 2019-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Marvin Sauerborn (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-03-24 | |||
7 | Maximilian Hannappel (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-05 | |||
8 | Emre Altin (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-07-28 | |||
11 | Berkan Yavuz (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-07-29 | |||
13 | Marcus Fritsch (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-02-10 | |||
18 | Alexis Weidenbach (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-09-24 | |||
30 | Marcello Dreher-Reinhardt (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-03-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jordi Arndt (until 2020-08-31) | 1998-04-22 | |||
10 | Hendrik Hillen (until 2019-12-31) | 1993-08-11 | |||
17 | Derrick Miles (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-08-24 | |||
39 | Armin Jusufi (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-09-15 | |||
57 | Ismayil Barut (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-02-08 | |||
77 | Sascha Engel (until 2019-12-31) | 1992-03-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |