Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bo Svensson | 1979-08-04 | ||||
Babak Keyhanfar (from 2024-09-12) (until 2024-09-15) | 1985-04-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frederik Ronnow | 1992-08-04 | |||
12 | Carl Klaus | 1994-01-16 | |||
37 | Alexander Schwolow | 1992-06-02 | |||
39 | Yannic Stein | 2004-09-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Kevin Vogt | 1991-09-23 | |||
3 | Paul Jaeckel (until 2024-08-29) | 1998-07-22 | |||
4 | Diogo Leite | 1999-01-23 | |||
5 | Danilho Doekhi | 1998-06-30 | |||
15 | Tom Alexander Rothe | 2004-10-29 | |||
18 | Josip Juranović | 1995-08-16 | |||
26 | Jérôme Roussillon | 1993-01-06 | |||
28 | Christopher Trimmel | 1987-02-24 | |||
41 | Oluwaseun God Power Osaro Ogbemudia | 2006-07-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Rani Khedira | 1994-01-27 | |||
13 | András Schäfer | 1999-04-13 | |||
14 | Leopold Querfeld | 2003-12-20 | |||
19 | Janik Haberer | 1994-04-02 | |||
20 | Laszlo Benes | 1997-09-09 | |||
21 | Tim Skarke | 1996-09-07 | |||
29 | Lucas Tousart | 1997-04-29 | |||
36 | Aljoscha Kemlein | 2004-08-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Woo-Yeong Jeong (from 2024-08-27) | 1999-09-20 | ||||
Andrej Ilic | 2000-04-03 | ||||
Robert Skov (from 2024-09-04) | 1996-05-20 | ||||
9 | Ivan Prtajin | 1996-05-14 | |||
10 | Kevin Volland | 1992-07-30 | |||
11 | Chris Bedia (until 2024-08-22) | 1996-03-05 | |||
14 | Yorbe Vertessen | 2001-01-08 | |||
16 | Benedict Hollerbach | 2001-05-17 | |||
17 | Theoson-Jordan Siebatcheu | 1996-04-26 | |||
35 | David Preu | 2004-10-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Paul Jaeckel (from 2024-08-29) | 1998-07-22 | ||||
Lennart Grill | 1999-01-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2024-08-17 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2024-10-30 20:45 |
- : - |
Compare |