Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bo Henriksen | 1975-02-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lasse Riess | 2001-07-27 | |||
27 | Robin Zentner | 1994-10-28 | |||
33 | Daniel Batz | 1991-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Phillipp Mwene | 1994-01-29 | |||
3 | Moritz Jenz (from 2024-08-28) | 1999-04-30 | |||
5 | Maxim Leitsch | 1998-05-18 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell | 1991-08-24 | |||
19 | Anthony Caci | 1997-07-01 | |||
20 | Edimilson Fernandes (until 2024-08-30) | 1996-04-15 | |||
21 | Danny da Costa | 1993-07-13 | |||
25 | Andreas Hanche-Olsen | 1997-01-17 | |||
30 | Silvan Widmer | 1993-03-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hyunseok Hong (from 2024-08-29) | 1999-06-16 | ||||
4 | Aymen Barkok | 1998-05-21 | |||
6 | Kaishu Sano | 2000-12-30 | |||
7 | Jae-Sung Lee | 1992-08-10 | |||
8 | Paul Nebel | 2002-10-10 | |||
14 | Tom Krauss (until 2024-08-22) | 2001-06-22 | |||
18 | Nadiem Amiri | 1996-10-27 | |||
22 | Nikolas Veratschnig | 2003-01-24 | |||
31 | Dominik Kohr | 1994-01-31 | |||
41 | Eniss Shabani | 2003-05-29 | |||
47 | Maxim Bora Dal | 2006-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Gabriel Vidovic | 2003-12-01 | ||||
9 | Karim Onisiwo | 1992-03-17 | |||
10 | Marco Richter (until 2024-08-28) | 1997-11-24 | |||
11 | Armindo Sieb | 2003-02-17 | |||
29 | Jonathan Burkardt | 2000-07-11 | |||
43 | Brajan Gruda | 2004-05-31 | |||
44 | Nelson Weiper | 2005-03-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marco Richter (from 2024-08-28) | 1997-11-24 | ||||
17 | Ludovic Ajorque | 1994-02-25 | |||
20 | Edimilson Fernandes (from 2024-08-30) | 1996-04-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2024-08-16 18:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2024-10-30 20:45 |
- : - |
Compare |