Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Scherning | 1983-10-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Julian Moser | 2000-02-23 | ||||
Leon Herdes | |||||
Marko Johansson | 1998-08-25 | ||||
1 | Lennart Grill | 1999-01-25 | |||
13 | Tino Casali | 1995-11-14 | |||
34 | Justin Duda | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Paul Jaeckel (from 2024-08-29) | 1998-07-22 | ||||
5 | Robert Ivanov | 1994-09-19 | |||
6 | Ermin Bicakcic | 1990-01-24 | |||
18 | Marvin-Lee Rittmuller | 1999-03-07 | |||
19 | Leon Bell Bell | 1996-09-06 | |||
21 | Kevin Ehlers | 2001-01-23 | |||
22 | Fabio Di-Michele-Sanchez | 2003-03-14 | |||
23 | Anderson-Lenda Lucoqui | 1997-07-06 | |||
25 | Sanoussy Ba | 2004-01-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Walid Ould-Chikh | 1999-11-06 | ||||
4 | Jannis Nikolaou | 1993-07-31 | |||
7 | Fabio Kaufmann | 1992-09-08 | |||
8 | Niklas Tauer | 2001-02-17 | |||
11 | Levente Szabo | 1999-06-06 | |||
15 | Max Marie | 2004-10-02 | |||
27 | Sven Kohler | 1996-11-08 | |||
29 | Karim Hüneburg | 2005-02-25 | |||
37 | Sidney Raebiger | 2005-04-17 | |||
39 | Robin Krausse | 1994-04-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Linus Queisser | 2003-03-14 | ||||
Sebastian Polter | 1991-04-01 | ||||
9 | Rayan Philippe | 2000-10-23 | |||
17 | Youssef Amyn (until 2024-08-29) | 2003-08-21 | |||
32 | Christian Conteh | 1999-08-27 | |||
44 | Johan Gómez | 2001-07-23 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Rami Zouaoui | 2004-07-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2024-08-19 20:45 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |