Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Sebald | 1996-07-27 | |||
12 | Elias Bethke | 2003-03-21 | |||
30 | Karl Pischon | 2004-03-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Henry Rorig | 2000-03-03 | |||
4 | Tim Campulka | 1999-04-28 | |||
15 | Edgar Kaizer | 2004-04-07 | |||
19 | Filip Kusic | 1996-06-03 | |||
20 | Axel Borgmann | 1994-07-08 | |||
27 | Dennis Slamar | 1994-09-08 | |||
28 | Niko Bretschneider | 1999-08-10 | |||
31 | Paul Milde | 1995-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tobias Röder | 1997-09-19 | ||||
Arne Seemann (from 2024-07-09) | 2006-05-02 | ||||
5 | Dominik Pelivan | 1996-06-08 | |||
6 | Jonas Hofmann | 1997-02-07 | |||
8 | Joshua Putze | 1994-12-02 | |||
10 | Tolcay Cigerci | 1995-01-24 | |||
21 | Yannik Moker | 1999-07-27 | |||
23 | Maximilian Krauss | 1996-11-24 | |||
32 | Finn Heidrich | ||||
33 | Jan Shcherbakovski | 2001-03-24 | |||
36 | Janis Juckel | 2004-07-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Lucas Copado (from 2024-08-22) | 2004-01-10 | ||||
7 | Timmy Thiele | 1991-07-31 | |||
9 | Romarjo Hajrulla | 1998-12-01 | |||
11 | Phil Halbauer | 1998-08-17 | |||
14 | Tobias Hasse | 1996-01-03 | |||
17 | Maximilian Oesterhelweg | 1990-07-21 | |||
22 | Rudolf Dovn Ndualu (until 2024-09-02) | 1999-07-22 | |||
24 | Timo Bornemann | 2000-12-01 | |||
42 | Maximilian Pronichev | 1997-11-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2024-08-19 18:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |