Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dirk Orlishausen | 1982-08-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hollerbach | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Benjamin Uphoff | 1993-08-08 | ||||
Philipp Klewin | 1993-09-30 | ||||
30 | Max Hagemoser | 2003-01-07 | |||
38 | Elias Höftmann | 2004-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan Mejdr | 1995-05-11 | ||||
Dario Gebuhr | 2003-05-06 | ||||
King Manu (from 2024-08-30) | 2003-11-23 | ||||
3 | Dominik Lanius | 1997-03-28 | |||
4 | Damian Rossbach | 1993-02-27 | |||
7 | Nico Neidhart | 1994-09-27 | |||
15 | Nils Fröling | 2000-04-20 | |||
15 | Ahmet Gurleyen | 1999-04-26 | |||
17 | Jannis Lang (until 2024-09-02) | 2002-07-12 | |||
21 | Alexander Rossipal | 1996-06-06 | |||
29 | Felix Ruschke | 2003-03-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jonas Michel Dirkner | 2002-07-15 | ||||
Franz Pfanne | 1994-12-10 | ||||
Cedrick Harenbrock | 1998-04-19 | ||||
Marco Schuster | 1995-10-10 | ||||
35 | Joshua Krüger | 2004-05-17 | |||
37 | Louis Köster | 2003-01-25 | |||
42 | Benno Dietze | 2003-07-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sigurd Haugen (from 2024-09-02) | 1997-07-17 | ||||
Ryan Naderi (from 2024-09-01) | 2003-07-10 | ||||
Antonio Jonjic (from 2024-09-02) | 1999-08-02 | ||||
9 | Albin Berisha | 2001-01-14 | |||
13 | Kevin Schumacher | 1997-12-24 | |||
14 | Adrien Lebeau | 1999-07-08 | |||
27 | Christian Kinsombi | 1999-08-24 | |||
44 | Tim Krohn | 2005-10-07 | |||
45 | Sveinn Gudjohnsen (until 2024-08-30) | 1998-05-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2024-08-18 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |