Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sascha Hildmann | 1972-04-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Johannes Schenk | 2003-01-13 | |||
26 | Morten Behrens | 1997-04-01 | |||
33 | Marian Kirsch | 2004-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Mikkel Kirkeskov | 1991-09-05 | |||
6 | Torge Paetow | 1995-08-14 | |||
10 | Sebastian Mrowca | 1994-01-16 | |||
15 | Simon Scherder | 1993-04-02 | |||
22 | Dominik Schad | 1997-03-04 | |||
24 | Niko Koulis | 1999-05-04 | |||
25 | Luca Bolay | 2002-07-25 | |||
27 | Jano ter Horst | ||||
29 | Lukas Frenkert | 2000-07-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Thomas Kok | 1998-05-15 | |||
7 | Daniel Kankam Kyerewaa | 2001-10-05 | |||
8 | Joshua Mees | 1996-03-15 | |||
11 | Thorben Deters | 1995-08-20 | |||
18 | Marc Lorenz | 1988-07-18 | |||
20 | Jorrit Hendrix (from 2024-07-23) | 1995-02-06 | |||
21 | Rico Preissinger | 1996-07-21 | |||
32 | Luca Bazzoli | 2000-11-01 | |||
39 | Jakob Korte | 2003-06-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Etienne Amenyido | 1998-03-01 | ||||
András Németh (from 2024-08-23) | 2002-11-09 | ||||
Hólmbert Fridjónsson | 1993-04-19 | ||||
5 | Yassine Bouchama | ||||
9 | Joel Grodowski | 1997-11-30 | |||
14 | Charalambos Makridis | 1996-07-05 | |||
17 | Ogechika Heil (until 2024-08-15) | 2000-11-27 | |||
23 | Malik Batmaz | 2000-03-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
19 | Marvin Benjamins | 2002-09-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2024-08-27 20:45 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |