Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Dabrowski | 1978-07-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jakob Golz | 1998-08-16 | |||
31 | Ole Springer | 1991-11-29 | |||
35 | Felix Wienand | 2002-06-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Schultz | 1993-05-30 | ||||
Nicolai Schulte-Kellinghaus | |||||
3 | Aaron Frimpong Manu (until 2024-09-03) | 1999-12-02 | |||
17 | Ekin Celebi | 2000-06-06 | |||
19 | Eric Schmidt | 2001-09-25 | |||
23 | Jose-Enrique Rios Alonso | 2000-08-13 | |||
33 | Tobias Kraulich | 1999-03-24 | |||
36 | Berkant Gedikli (until 2024-08-28) | 2005-02-27 | |||
39 | Gianluca Swajkowski | 2005-04-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julian Eitschberger (from 2024-08-23) | 2004-03-05 | ||||
Tom Moustier | 2002-05-02 | ||||
Jimmy Adrian Kaparos | 2001-12-25 | ||||
Ahmet Arslan | 1994-03-30 | ||||
Robbie D Haese | 1999-02-25 | ||||
Dion Berisha | 2003-05-09 | ||||
7 | Andreas Wiegel (until 2024-08-30) | 1991-07-21 | |||
10 | Thomas Eisfeld | 1993-01-18 | |||
14 | Lucas Brumme | 1999-09-25 | |||
16 | Mustafa Kourouma | 2003-01-09 | |||
18 | Nils Florian Kaiser | 2002-02-03 | |||
20 | Leonardo Vonic | 2003-07-10 | |||
26 | Torben Musel | 1999-07-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Kelsey Owusu Aninkorah-Meisel (from 2024-09-01) | 2004-06-19 | ||||
Manuel Wintzheimer | 1999-01-10 | ||||
Joseph Boyamba (from 2024-09-02) | 1996-07-29 | ||||
11 | Ramien Safi | 1999-10-17 | |||
29 | Moussa Doumbouya | 1997-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2024-08-17 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |