Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Julian Schuster | 1985-04-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Noah Atubolu | 2002-05-25 | |||
21 | Florian Muller | 1997-11-13 | |||
24 | Jannik Huth | 1994-04-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Hugo Siquet (until 2024-07-23) | 2002-07-09 | |||
3 | Philipp Lienhart | 1996-07-11 | |||
4 | Tan-Kenneth Leka-Schmidt | 2002-06-03 | |||
5 | Manuel Gulde | 1991-02-12 | |||
17 | Lukas Kubler | 1992-08-30 | |||
25 | Kiliann Sildillia | 2002-05-16 | |||
28 | Matthias Ginter | 1994-01-19 | |||
30 | Christian Gunter | 1993-02-28 | |||
33 | Jordy Makengo | 2001-08-03 | |||
37 | Max Rosenfelder | 2003-02-10 | |||
39 | Berkay Yilmaz (until 2024-08-27) | 2005-02-25 | |||
43 | Bruno Ogbus | 2005-12-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Patrick Osterhage | 2000-02-01 | |||
7 | Noah Weisshaupt | 2001-09-20 | |||
8 | Maximilian Eggestein | 1996-12-08 | |||
22 | Roland Sallai | 1997-05-22 | |||
23 | Florent Muslija | 1998-07-06 | |||
27 | Nicolas Hofler | 1990-03-09 | |||
32 | Vincenzo Grifo | 1993-04-07 | |||
34 | Merlin Rohl | 2002-07-05 | |||
44 | Johan Manzambi | 2005-10-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Lucas Holer | 1994-07-10 | |||
11 | Daniel Kyereh | 1996-03-08 | |||
18 | Eren Sami Dinkci | 2001-12-13 | |||
20 | Junior Adamu | 2001-06-06 | |||
26 | Maximilian Philipp | 1994-03-01 | |||
38 | Michael Gregoritsch | 1994-04-18 | |||
42 | Ritsu Doan | 1998-06-16 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Berkay Yilmaz (from 2024-08-27) | 2005-02-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2024-08-17 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2024-10-30 18:00 |
- : - |
Compare |