Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fabian Lubbers | 1991-10-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Steffen Westphal | 1999-05-01 | |||
12 | Laurenz Beckemeyer | 2000-04-16 | |||
44 | Luis Hillemeier | 2001-12-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Armagan Beytullah Ozer | 2000-07-27 | |||
5 | Jeff Mensah | 2001-12-11 | |||
8 | Johannes Sabah | 1997-11-20 | |||
19 | Leonel Brodersen | 1997-07-11 | |||
22 | Denis Milic | 2004-06-07 | |||
25 | Nico Lubke | 2001-07-31 | |||
26 | Felix Mensing | 2001-09-08 | |||
37 | Albin Thaqi | 2002-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Leon Demaj | 1997-11-28 | ||||
Kevin Holzweiler | 1994-10-16 | ||||
4 | Philip Fontein | 1993-10-05 | |||
6 | Niklas Determann | 2002-03-22 | |||
10 | Fatlum Elezi | 1998-07-19 | |||
13 | Tugay Gundogan | 1995-07-28 | |||
14 | Leon Gino Schmidt | 2001-06-08 | |||
16 | Nico Thier | 1998-09-10 | |||
17 | Kamer Krasniqi | 1996-01-11 | |||
24 | Fatih Ufuk | 1998-05-24 | |||
27 | Elario Ghassan | 2001-03-30 | |||
39 | Florian Wendt | 2001-01-18 | |||
77 | Halil Dogan (until 2024-09-01) | 1999-11-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Vincent Schaub (from 2024-09-02) | 1999-02-20 | ||||
7 | Lars Spit | 1998-06-24 | |||
9 | Kevin Schacht | 2002-10-05 | |||
11 | Burinyuy Nyuydine | 2000-12-25 | |||
20 | Marc Heider | 1986-05-18 | |||
23 | Yassin Ibrahim | 2000-02-09 | |||
29 | Samuel Owusu Addai | 2002-02-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2024-08-18 18:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |