Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Ruthenbeck (until 2024-06-30) | 1972-04-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Max Hagemoser (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-07 | ||||
Jonas Urbig (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-08 | ||||
Ben Dennerlein (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-08 | ||||
Mike Dreier (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Kaden Amaniampong (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-26 | ||||
Malte Höhn (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-21 | ||||
Emin Kujovic (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-29 | ||||
Marlon Monning (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-18 | ||||
Rijad Smajic (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-02 | ||||
Matti Wagner (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Namory Noel Cisse (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-05 | ||||
Nicolas Urso (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-31 | ||||
Simon Breuer (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | ||||
Mikail Özkan (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-29 | ||||
Ben Decker (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-05 | ||||
Carlo Kettig (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-10 | ||||
Pierre Nadjombe (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-10 | ||||
Winzent Suchanek (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-16 | ||||
Vladimir Fratea (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-27 | ||||
Vladislav Fadeev (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-28 | ||||
Mathias Olesen (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-03-21 | ||||
Romeo Aigbekaen (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-22 | ||||
Elias Bakatukanda (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-13 | ||||
Nicolas Bajlicz (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-08 | ||||
Giuliano Breve (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-12 | ||||
Max Finkgräfe (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-27 | ||||
Lennox Kern (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-12 | ||||
Jakob Krautkrämer (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-15 | ||||
Michel Möller (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Philipp Wydra (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-07 | ||||
Abdul Yilmaz (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-05-27 | ||||
Luan Simnica (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-23 | ||||
Neo Telle (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-24 | ||||
Nick Zimmermann (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-01-13 | ||||
Justin Welter (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-12 | ||||
Kai-Maxime Vranken (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-29 | ||||
Jona Steinbach (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-07 | ||||
Nik Orth (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-18 | ||||
Lukas Kubek (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-02 | ||||
Luca Heise (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-04 | ||||
Luis Hauer (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Fayssal Harchaoui (until 2022-06-30) | 2006-01-15 | ||||
Paul Gelber (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-20 | ||||
Aaron Bayakala (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-19 | ||||
Marlon Becker (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-31 | ||||
Benjamin Bußmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | ||||
Jens Castrop (until 2022-01-06) | 2003-07-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
Meiko Wäschenbach (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Maximilian Schmid (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | ||||
Justin Diehl (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-11-27 | ||||
Luis Cortijo Lange (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-05 | ||||
Damion Downs (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-06 | ||||
Lars Ganzhorn (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-20 | ||||
Josia-Levi Walther (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-08 | ||||
Jaka Cuber (from 2022-04-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2021-09-22 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |