Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sascha Eickel (until 2022-06-30) | 1975-06-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Mert Temiz (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-12 | ||||
Nils Brühl (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-10 | ||||
1 | Ben Zich (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-16 | |||
1 | Linus Wirth (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-27 | |||
30 | Philipp Groß (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ibrahim Digberekou (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-22 | ||||
Timo Piel (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-29 | ||||
Adonis Milaj (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-07 | ||||
Luca Netz (from 2021-08-06) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-05-15 | ||||
Hugo Schmidt (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-31 | ||||
3 | Aaron Addo (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-12 | |||
5 | Dimitrie Deumi-Nappi (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-16 | |||
12 | Aaron Schreck (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-08 | |||
13 | Leo Arndt (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Joshua Lucky Joseph (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-08-16 | ||||
Emre Acarsoy (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-10 | ||||
Noah Adedeji (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-19 | ||||
David Arize (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-07-02 | ||||
Florian Dimmer (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-15 | ||||
Alexandros Evangelou (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-22 | ||||
Konstantin Gerhardt (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-16 | ||||
Mohamed Ghait (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | ||||
Daniel Hülsenbusch (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-18 | ||||
Christoph Nickel (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-14 | ||||
Vincent Zajaczkowski (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-25 | ||||
3 | Simon Walde (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-04 | |||
7 | Selim Turping (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-11-12 | |||
9 | Ryan Naderi (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-10 | |||
11 | Yvandro Sanches (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-24 | |||
14 | Micael Nack (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-02 | |||
17 | Malcom Scheibner (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-09 | |||
23 | Tony Reitz (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-05 | |||
24 | Shaban Zenku (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-04 | |||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
8 | Moustafa Moustafa (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jan Volle (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | ||||
Tim Liuca Zimpel (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-20 | ||||
Luca Nikolai (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-02 | ||||
Max Schreiber (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-06 | ||||
Michael Nduka (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-06-19 | ||||
4 | Arne Michaelis (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-31 | |||
6 | Noah Andreas (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-27 | |||
7 | Dillon Ifunanya Hoogewerf (from 2022-01-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-27 | |||
10 | Cameron Arnold (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-01 | |||
15 | Yassir Atty (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-10 | |||
15 | Luis Werrmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-10-07 | |||
16 | Luca Barata (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-19 | |||
18 | Leon Schütz (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-24 | |||
19 | Cem Dag (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-16 | |||
20 | Kushtrim Asallari (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-23 | |||
22 | Donatus Nweke (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2021-09-22 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-07 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |