Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Federico Valente (until 2023-06-30) | 1975-07-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dean Savic (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-03 | ||||
Laurin Mack (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-12-17 | ||||
Malte Brüning (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-18 | ||||
23 | Marvin Mettenberger (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-12-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Carlos Gallego Martos (from 2021-07-22) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-24 | ||||
Rafael Pfauser (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Philip Ilczuk (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Max Rosenfelder (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-10 | ||||
Brian Atta Gyan (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Aleksandr Sapovalov (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-28 | ||||
Niklas Sauter (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-04-06 | ||||
Ali Ibrahim (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-12 | ||||
Marius Kaiser (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-12 | ||||
Robert Wagner (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-14 | ||||
Maik Wichmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-31 | ||||
Lars Kehl (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-04-08 | ||||
Leorat Bega (from 2021-07-22) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-18 | ||||
Mathias Leander Hülsenbusch (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-31 | ||||
Marek Bleise (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-22 | ||||
Gloire Capitao (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-04 | ||||
Till Mühlethaler (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-08-07 | ||||
Philip Fahrner (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-02 | ||||
Tom Mertz (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-22 | ||||
Gabriele Cioffi (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-15 | ||||
Gabriel Pellegrino (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-25 | ||||
Alex Echner (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-09 | ||||
Mika Baur (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-07-09 | ||||
Adrian Jogerst (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-30 | ||||
Felix Allgaier (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-01 | ||||
Lenny Mändle (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-28 | ||||
Joel Ribeiro (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-14 | ||||
Timo Birk (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-05-04 | ||||
Daniel Au Yeong (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-10 | ||||
Noah Wagner (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-05-05 | ||||
Luca Marino (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-17 | ||||
Neo Oehler (until 2021-12-31) | 2003-07-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jihan Lee (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-08 | ||||
Amney Moutassime (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-01 | ||||
Marco Wörner (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-09-25 | ||||
Berkay Yilmaz (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-02-25 | ||||
Yann Sturm (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-28 11:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-11-06 11:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-12-12 11:00 |
3 : 1 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-03-12 11:00 |
0 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |