Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Nico Willig (until 2024-06-30) | 1980-12-11 | ||||
Nico Willig (until 2023-06-30) | 1980-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kilian Scharner (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-06 | ||||
Dennis Seimen (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-12-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jakov Suver (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-22 | ||||
Claudiu-Gabriel Niculescu (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-13 | ||||
Leon Reichardt (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-06-28 | ||||
Paul König (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-08-30 | ||||
Nathan Winkler (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-04-24 | ||||
Marvin Schuster (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-19 | ||||
Luis Mestre (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-05 | ||||
12 | Moussa Cisse (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julian Kudala (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-18 | ||||
Marcel Streit (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-08 | ||||
Mohamed Sankoh (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-10-16 | ||||
Tobias Werdich (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-17 | ||||
Djibril Djeukam Nana (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-29 | ||||
Mattis Hoppe (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-23 | ||||
Lukas Laupheimer (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-04-10 | ||||
Robin Littig (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-31 | ||||
Niklas Ambrosius (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-07 | ||||
Davino Knappe (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-07 | ||||
Raul Paula (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-25 | ||||
Babis Drakas (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-04 | ||||
Mehmet Sahin (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-03-16 | ||||
Mirhan Inan (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-06-14 | ||||
Thomas Kastanaras (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-09 | ||||
Luca Raimund (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-04-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
Laurin Ulrich (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-01-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Luis Damasio Ribeiro (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-01-06 | ||||
Luka Arslan (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-24 | ||||
Elisio Widmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-14 | ||||
Maximilian Wagner (until 2022-06-30) | 2004-02-06 | ||||
Alexis Tibidi (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-11-03 | ||||
Lukas Sonnenwald (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-09 | ||||
Benjamin Bediako Boakye (until 2022-06-30) | 2005-03-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-28 11:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2021-11-07 10:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2021-12-11 10:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-03-13 11:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2022-05-20 17:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |