Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Wölfel (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-12-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jannis Leinweber (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-07 | ||||
1 | Robert Kampa (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-13 | |||
12 | Tim Kallis (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-19 | |||
30 | Niclas Burkhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tony Reh (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-01 | ||||
Leonard Mergner (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-21 | ||||
2 | Richard Meier (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-11 | |||
3 | Ole Achtenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-02 | |||
4 | Moritz Ruffing (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-10 | |||
22 | Achilleas Oikonomidis (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mathis Frohberg (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-11 | ||||
Jonas Schulz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-24 | ||||
Oleg Scheiermann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-30 | ||||
5 | Ben Engelhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-28 | |||
6 | Valentin Masuth (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | |||
7 | Conner Schulze (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-03 | |||
8 | Elias Schültke (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-19 | |||
10 | Joel Marks (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-20 | |||
11 | Ludwig Bölke (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-11 | |||
13 | Lasse Behlendorf (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-24 | |||
14 | Vedat Tunc (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-06 | |||
14 | Julius Mehnert (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-07 | |||
15 | Nick Höfer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-01 | |||
18 | Timucin Sanatci (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-08 | |||
19 | Lukas Stridde (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-19 | |||
23 | Jakob Klautzsch (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-31 | |||
24 | Mamy Conde (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-29 | |||
24 | Benan Hamidovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-28 | |||
25 | Matti Schauer (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-27 | |||
25 | Patrick Thon (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-10 | |||
26 | Emmanuel Elekwa (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Timo Birk (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-04 | |||
20 | Carlos Krüger (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-03 | |||
22 | Dustin Strobach (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-09-10 11:30 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |