Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Benjamin Hoffmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1979-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Louis Babatz (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-14 | ||||
Aki Koch (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-18 | ||||
David Mitrovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-05 | ||||
Mehmet Özcelik (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Pit Zuther (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-24 | ||||
Leander Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Azakir (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-26 | ||||
Stjepan Pavisic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-28 | ||||
Dominik Pestic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-29 | ||||
Jusuf Ugljanin (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-07 | ||||
Tyrese Zeigler (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jason Amann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-13 | ||||
Maxim Bora Dal (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-26 | ||||
Aiman Dardari (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-21 | ||||
Ilias Elyazidi (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Fritz Engel (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-12 | ||||
Izzet Erdal (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-27 | ||||
Joonas Frenzel (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-08 | ||||
Daniel Gleiber (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-01 | ||||
Bastian Görtler (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-17 | ||||
Levin Göttmann (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Justus Götze (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-05 | ||||
Brajan Gruda (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-31 | ||||
Samuel Hasa (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-10 | ||||
Sean Horozovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-05 | ||||
Marcel Kalemba (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-06 | ||||
Tarik Karaman (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Noa Kljajic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-19 | ||||
Nik Leipold (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-04 | ||||
Julian Finn Malburg (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-16 | ||||
Emanuel-Pavel Marincau (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-07 | ||||
Ivan Martinovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-26 | ||||
Tim Müller (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-23 | ||||
Nico Neukirch (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-25 | ||||
Lennart Niederländer (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-22 | ||||
Valentin Schmitt (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-24 | ||||
Luca Leon Tauer (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-06 | ||||
Jack Antony Townsend (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-27 | ||||
Melvin-Joe Wiesnet (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-31 | ||||
Georg-Frederic Zinn (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-13 | ||||
Philipp Schulz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-25 | ||||
Safyan Toure (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-06 | ||||
Ronald Mendi (until 2023-02-25) | 2006-01-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Younes Azahaf (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-01 | ||||
Ayoub Bagdadi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-27 | ||||
Lovis Bierschenk (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-22 | ||||
Grigorijs Degtjarevs (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-07 | ||||
Dennis Kaygin (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-02 | ||||
Nelson Weiper (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-17 | ||||
12 | Sinisa Tanjga (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-09-11 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-15 12:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-12-11 11:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-04-02 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |