Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sven Hubscher (until 2024-06-30) | 1979-01-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roy Steur (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-01 | |||
12 | Luca Novodomsky (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-26 | |||
22 | Maximilian Neutgens (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-03 | |||
35 | Oleksandr Petrenko (from 2023-02-01) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Noah Mbamba (from 2023-01-14) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Zaid Amaussau-Tchibara (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-21 | ||||
Mats Flock (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-03 | ||||
Naba Mensah (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Jesper Schlich (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Sinan Solmaz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-21 | ||||
Emmanuel Frimpong (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-17 | ||||
Francis Onyeka (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Shahin Biniazz (until 2023-01-30) | 2004-08-29 | ||||
Julius Bugenhagen (until 2023-01-30) | 2005-03-11 | ||||
Iker Bravo (until 2022-08-28) | 2005-01-13 | ||||
3 | Anton Bäuerle (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-30 | |||
5 | Abdul-Wahid Bancé (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-12 | |||
6 | Leon Köhl (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-17 | |||
7 | Ingyom Jung (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-25 | |||
8 | Matija Marsenic (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
9 | Can Yahya Moustfa (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-19 | |||
10 | Jardell Kanga (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-13 | |||
11 | Volkan Ballicalioglu (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-10 | |||
14 | Jordan Zirkzee (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-04 | |||
17 | Jan Ecke (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-11 | |||
18 | Reno Münz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-02 | |||
20 | Ayman Aourir (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-06 | |||
21 | Emre Aksoy (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-12 | |||
23 | Noah Pesch (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-18 | |||
24 | Madi Monamay Nsosemo (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-06 | |||
25 | Isaiah Okafor (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-22 | |||
26 | Daniel Lang (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-11 | |||
27 | Filip Milojevic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | |||
27 | Ken Izekor (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
28 | Raoul Petak (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-11 | |||
29 | Zidan Sertdemir (until 2023-01-31) | 2005-02-04 | |||
30 | Enes Yilmaz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-07 | |||
31 | David Widlarz (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-03 | |||
33 | Arjanit Fazlija (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-09-10 11:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-15 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |