Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stephan Lerch (until 2023-03-12) | 1984-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Tim Philipp (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-12-21 | ||||
Lukas Petersson (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-09 | ||||
Tim Philipp (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Niklas Sörensen (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-02 | ||||
4 | Lars Strobl | 2005-04-15 | |||
4 | Hennes Behrens | 2005-01-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Benedikt Huber (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-05 | ||||
Sekou Doucoure-Tandiang (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-10-15 | ||||
Dennis Arnst (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-27 | ||||
Hennes Behrens (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-19 | ||||
Tom Bischof (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-28 | ||||
Abdoul Camara (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-21 | ||||
Diren Dagdeviren (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-08 | ||||
Sekou Doucoure-Tandiang (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-15 | ||||
Tim Drexler (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-06 | ||||
Ali-Eren Ersungur (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-11-22 | ||||
Leon Gebauer (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-28 | ||||
Paul Hennrich (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-06 | ||||
Yannis Hör (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-05 | ||||
Benedikt Huber (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-05 | ||||
Iven Kaiser (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-16 | ||||
Georgios Kiriakidis (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-17 | ||||
Florian Micheler (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-17 | ||||
Uche Destiny Obiogumu (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-27 | ||||
Tim Ottilinger (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-05 | ||||
Denis Perrone (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-19 | ||||
Kritsana Garn Pummarrin (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | ||||
Milan Rehus (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-04 | ||||
Matino Schlotterbeck (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-25 | ||||
Adijat Sefer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-20 | ||||
Paul Siegers (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-04 | ||||
Lars Strobl (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-15 | ||||
Lucas Tamarez (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-11 | ||||
Umut Tohumcu (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-11 | ||||
Louis Wagensommer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-11 | ||||
Linus Weik (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-22 | ||||
Luc Ziegler (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-15 | ||||
Joshua Quarshie (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-26 | ||||
Leart Haskaj (until 2023-01-31) | 2004-02-24 | ||||
2 | Yannis Hör (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-05 | |||
3 | Milan Rehus (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-08-04 | |||
6 | Diren Dagdeviren | 2005-03-08 | |||
8 | Florian Micheler (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-17 | |||
9 | Max Moerstedt (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Felix Hagmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-29 | ||||
Adam Mulele Lomoto (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-14 | ||||
Ricardo Wagner (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-20 | ||||
2 | Dennis Arnst (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-27 | |||
7 | Ricardo Wagner | 2005-01-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-09-11 12:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-15 12:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |