Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jonas Schittenhelm (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-08-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Erion Avdija (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | George Dumitru (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-09-12 | |||
5 | Sean Dulic (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-05 | |||
7 | Cristian Leone (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Martin Zentrich (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-20 | ||||
Marc Zimmermann (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-07 | ||||
Evarist Samey (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-01 | ||||
Max Jägerbauer (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-06 | ||||
Din Avdic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-03 | ||||
Erion Avdija (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-13 | ||||
Moritz Bangerter (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-03 | ||||
Anton Cindric (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-18 | ||||
Jeremiah Dosi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-10 | ||||
Sean Dulic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-05 | ||||
George Dumitru (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-12 | ||||
Emir Duran (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Christian Ehizibue (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-06 | ||||
Arin Garza (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-04 | ||||
Mike Gevorgyan (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-01 | ||||
Mert Güzelarslan (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-13 | ||||
Max Jägerbauer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-06 | ||||
Xaver Kiefersauer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-10-01 | ||||
Luan Klose (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | ||||
Noah Klose (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | ||||
Tim Kloss (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-05 | ||||
Noah Kocoglu (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | ||||
Cristian Leone (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-12 | ||||
Teo Marosevic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-19 | ||||
Carlos Mila-Baier (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-21 | ||||
Leandro Morgalla (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-13 | ||||
Fabien Ngounou Djayo (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-04 | ||||
Raphael Ott (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-15 | ||||
Miran Qela (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Lukas Reich (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Moritz Rem (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-01 | ||||
Muck Riedmüller (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-16 | ||||
Evarist Samey (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-01 | ||||
Tizian Schatto (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-07 | ||||
Yannik Seils (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-17 | ||||
Devin Sür (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-29 | ||||
Justin Thönig (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-10-29 | ||||
Nathan Wicht (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-20 | ||||
Marius Wörl (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-05 | ||||
Marc Zimmermann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-07 | ||||
Christian Naveen (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-10 | ||||
Mansour Ouro-Tagba (until 2023-05-30) | 2004-12-17 | ||||
6 | Xaver Kiefersauer (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-10-01 | |||
8 | Arin Garza (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-04 | |||
10 | Mike Gevorgyan (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Naveen (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-10 | ||||
Luan Klose (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | ||||
Aulon Mushla (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-28 | ||||
9 | Noah Klose (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-30 | |||
11 | Raphael Ott | 2005-12-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-09-10 14:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |