Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Nico Willig (until 2024-06-30) | 1980-12-11 | ||||
Nico Willig (until 2023-06-30) | 1980-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Robin Maurice Dittrich (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Florian Hellstern (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Nils Richter (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Tim Schulz (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-15 | ||||
Dennis Seimen (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-01 | ||||
Martin Stojcevic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-28 | ||||
1 | Florian Hellstern | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Semih Kara | 2005-05-05 | ||||
Paul König (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-30 | ||||
Hugo Aris Kretschmar (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-13 | ||||
Dimitrios Mitakidis (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-07 | ||||
Claudiu-Gabriel Niculescu (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-13 | ||||
Leon Reichardt (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-28 | ||||
Nuredin Rexhepi (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-19 | ||||
Jan-Carlo Simic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-02 | ||||
Nathan Winkler (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-24 | ||||
Yohann Torres (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-06 | ||||
Bendito Calemba (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-29 | ||||
2 | Tom Barth (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-11 | |||
3 | Alexandre Azevedo | 2005-03-25 | |||
5 | Peter Reinhardt (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Luca Battista (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-11 | ||||
Colin Farnerud (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-12 | ||||
Niklas Ambrosius (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-07 | ||||
Samuele Di Benedetto (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-16 | ||||
Noah Dotzauer (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-10 | ||||
Paulo Fritschi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-20 | ||||
Maximilian Herwerth (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-09 | ||||
Mike Huras (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-28 | ||||
Efe Korkut Martin (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-23 | ||||
Elton Krasniqi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-27 | ||||
Karlo Kuranyi (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-27 | ||||
Julian Lüers (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-25 | ||||
Homam Mahmoud (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-08 | ||||
Dorian Migalic (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-12 | ||||
Raul Paula (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-25 | ||||
Lauri Penna (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-02 | ||||
Laurin Preuß (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-26 | ||||
Luca Raimund (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-09 | ||||
Eliyah Rau (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-20 | ||||
Peter Reinhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-23 | ||||
Mehmet Sahin (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-16 | ||||
Nevio Schembri (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-29 | ||||
Lucca Telles-Villalobos (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-17 | ||||
Tim Windsheimer (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-30 | ||||
Julian Kudala (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-18 | ||||
Marcel Streit (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-08 | ||||
Tom Barth (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-11 | ||||
Luca Battista (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-11 | ||||
Eliot Bujupi (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-07 | ||||
Semih Kara (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-05 | ||||
Riccardo Krizan (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-13 | ||||
Laurin Ulrich (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-31 | ||||
Christopher Charl Olivier (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-31 | ||||
11 | Luca Raimund (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Karlo Kuranyi | 2005-09-27 | ||||
Alexandre Azevedo (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-25 | ||||
Benjamin Bediako Boakye (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-07 | ||||
Luis Damasio Ribeiro (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-06 | ||||
Jarzinho Ataide Malanga (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-07-10 | ||||
Muhadin Sulejmani (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-04 | ||||
Maximilian Wagner (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-06 | ||||
Elisio Widmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-14 | ||||
9 | Elton Krasniqi (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-27 | |||
10 | Benjamin Bediako Boakye (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-09-10 14:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-10-15 11:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2022-12-11 11:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |