Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marc-Andre Kruska (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-06-29 | ||||
Heiko Butscher (until 2023-06-30) | 1980-07-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jeremias Heufken (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-04 | ||||
Ricardo Fischbach (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-12 | ||||
1 | Finn Kotyrba (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-13 | |||
18 | Hugo Rölleke (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marlon Schmitz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-14 | |||
4 | Tim Oermann (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-10-06 | |||
5 | Niko Bozickovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-07 | |||
12 | Luca Leon Bernsdorf (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-06-03 | |||
15 | David Hartmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-07-04 | |||
17 | Mohammed Tolba (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-07-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Erik Peters (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-11 | ||||
Luka Blazevic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-05 | ||||
Semih Yakup Aksoy (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-15 | ||||
Tin-Anjcur Banner (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-03 | ||||
Carl Fallenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-19 | ||||
Len Blackmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-06 | ||||
Yannick Blaszyk (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-11 | ||||
Luc Dabrowski (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-01-26 | ||||
Zinedine Durmus (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-16 | ||||
Ciwan Günes (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-27 | ||||
Suat Fajic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-13 | ||||
Paul Kalkoff (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Phil Hoffmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-08-15 | ||||
Mamadou Barry (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-11 | ||||
Julian Etse (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-03-23 | ||||
Efe Colak (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-05-27 | ||||
Jannis Hackmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-02-19 | ||||
Niklas Klinke (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Cajetan Lenz (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-16 | ||||
Jan Nzeba-Bost (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-04 | ||||
Joel Schlotter (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
Max-Luca Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-19 | ||||
Mika Völker (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-03 | ||||
Adrian Yanga Mboyo (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-04-10 | ||||
3 | Alessio Argenziano (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-10-10 | |||
3 | Yusuf-Alptug Oguz (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-26 | |||
6 | Nico Böll (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-25 | |||
7 | Josue Santo (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-05 | |||
10 | Ali Demirel (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
10 | Leon Tasov (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-13 | |||
13 | Jayden Joel Peters (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-09-30 | |||
16 | Lennart Koerdt (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-07 | |||
17 | Adam Tolba (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-05-30 | |||
19 | Artur Golubytskij (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-31 | |||
20 | Ismail Bah (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-10 | |||
21 | Luca Erdelkamp (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-03-24 | |||
24 | Luca Fava (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-10 | |||
26 | Jean-Philippe Njike Nana (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-08-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Dominick Wasilewski (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-04 | |||
9 | Florian Berisha (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-06-04 | |||
11 | Robin Schultealbert (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
11 | Tunahan Yardimci (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-08-01 | |||
14 | Divine John Boafo (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-07 | |||
23 | Mohammad Mahmoud (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-09-10 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2022-10-13 13:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |