Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sven Hubscher (until 2024-06-30) | 1979-01-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Luca Novodomsky (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-26 | |||
12 | Jesper Schlich (from 2024-02-01) | ||||
22 | Borys Oleniak (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-09 | |||
35 | Oleksandr Petrenko (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
Feldspieler | |||||
Nourdine Camara (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Karim Dhouib (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-06-26 | ||||
Raffael Sommer (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-06-08 | ||||
Philipp Köhl (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-05-10 | ||||
3 | Anton Bäuerle (until 2024-05-25) | 2005-04-30 | |||
6 | Isaiah Okafor (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-22 | |||
7 | David Widlarz (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-03 | |||
8 | Matija Marsenic (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
9 | Jordan Zirkzee (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-04 | |||
10 | Jardell Kanga (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-12-13 | |||
14 | Larson Ferati (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
16 | Tyron Fernandes (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
17 | Arjanit Fazlija (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-05 | |||
18 | Reno Münz (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-10-02 | |||
19 | Mats Flock (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-03 | |||
20 | Francis Onyeka (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
21 | Akim Kister (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
23 | Noah Pesch (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-18 | |||
26 | Daniel Lang (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-11 | |||
27 | Filip Milojevic (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-09 | |||
28 | Raoul Petak (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-11 | |||
30 | Enes Yilmaz (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-07 | |||
30 | Isaiah Eichie (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
31 | Madi Monamay Nsosemo (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Fynn Meurer (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
27 | Melvin Ukpeigbe (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
30 | Artem Stepanov (from 2024-02-01) (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Emmanuel Frimpong (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-11-17 | ||||
Julien Kurowski (from 2024-03-01) (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
5 | Noah Mbamba (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-05 | |||
8 | Naba Mensah (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
11 | Ken Izekor (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
20 | Kerim-Sam Alajbegovic (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
27 | Boran Yörük (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
Sturm | |||||
16 | Márton Szép (until 2024-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2023-09-02 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-10-07 11:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-12-17 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |