Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Johrden (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-03-28 | ||||
Rodolfo Cardoso (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1968-10-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simon Heinbockel (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-08-18 | |||
23 | Hannes Hermann (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Noah Adekunle (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Soheil Begsade (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Romeo Blekic (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Reza Hosseini (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Jan-Lukas Jasper (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-12 | ||||
Fyn-Luca Lewinski (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Shafiq Bello Nandja (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Philipp Niedermeier (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Prince Quasi (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Moritz Reimers (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Arnaud Riedel (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Yasin Rusani (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
David Leander Schreiber (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Marcel Zym (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Maximilian Paul Cord Hellmers (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
2 | Kilian Filipe Hölscher Machado (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
2 | Julius Nehl (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-02 | |||
3 | Jamal Nabe (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-07-11 | |||
4 | Almin Suljevic (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-20 | |||
6 | Lukas Bornschein (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-03 | |||
6 | Benjamin Lamce (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-11-03 | |||
7 | Davis Rath (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-22 | |||
8 | Nick Hoffmann (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-14 | |||
9 | Omar Megeed (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-08-19 | |||
9 | Noah Wallenßus (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-30 | |||
10 | Bilal Yalcinkaya | 2006-03-30 | |||
11 | Otto Stange | ||||
11 | Fabio Balde (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-20 | |||
12 | Luis Eising (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-16 | |||
13 | Alex da Graca Marques (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-13 | |||
14 | Endrik Jaschan (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-29 | |||
15 | Joel Agyekum (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-08 | |||
16 | Maximilian Sarfo-Adjei (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-08 | |||
17 | Niklas Tuppeck (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-12 | |||
18 | Dayo Richardt (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-21 | |||
19 | Saido Balde (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
20 | Glory Eliel Kiveta-Ndongalasiya (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-11 | |||
21 | Amer Buljubasic (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-07-30 | |||
22 | Jeremy Gandert (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-09-12 | |||
23 | Abdoul Karim Coulibaly (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
25 | Agyemeng Nana-Sarhene (until 2024-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2023-09-02 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-10-07 11:00 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2023-12-17 11:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |