Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Danijel Zenkovic (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-03-31 | ||||
Sebastian Heidinger (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-01-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
22 | Timo Schlieck (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-02 | |||
22 | Luca Janosch (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-17 | |||
33 | Fernando Dickes | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Maddox Stadel (from 2024-04-01) (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Moritz Ae (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-23 | ||||
Mamadu Balde (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Jean Miguel Boog (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Oliver Bryks (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-26 | ||||
Benjamin Lottes (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Moritz Markowski (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-22 | ||||
Cenny Neumann (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Niklas Rohleder (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-08 | ||||
Anton Schneider (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-18 | ||||
Valentin Siepler (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-04-14 | ||||
Jamie Wagner (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-09-16 | ||||
Noah Weißbach (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Marcel Zajusch (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-08-19 | ||||
Vincent Bayindir (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-10 | ||||
Silas Prüfrock (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-25 | ||||
Lennart Johanns (until 2023-12-30) | 2005-03-25 | ||||
2 | Jamie Schuldes (from 2024-05-01) (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
2 | Oleksandr Havrylenko (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-08-26 | |||
4 | Jonathan Vonheim Norbye (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
5 | Lenny Hennig (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-13 | |||
5 | Vincent Zaruba (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-01-15 | |||
6 | Elias Lenz (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-09-01 | |||
7 | Paul Kühnhardt (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-09-10 | |||
8 | Simon Schierack (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-05 | |||
9 | Yannick Eduardo (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-23 | |||
10 | Laurin Schößler (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-09-04 | |||
11 | Joyeux Masanka Bungi (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
11 | Tino Kaufmann (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-21 | |||
12 | Lionel Voufack (from 2024-05-01) (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
12 | Arno Krause (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
13 | Tim Köhler (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-02 | |||
14 | Anton Bulland (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-02 | |||
15 | Tim Meyer (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-11 | |||
16 | Jakob Sachse (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-20 | |||
17 | Aris Bayindir (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
18 | Winners Osawe (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
19 | Oliver Schmidhauser (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-06-02 | |||
20 | Chilohem Onuoha (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-07 | |||
21 | Nuha Jatta (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-15 | |||
24 | David Damala | ||||
24 | Kurt Pestel (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-17 | |||
25 | Leon Koß (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-09-12 | |||
26 | Pepe Böhm (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-22 | |||
26 | Marwan Kponton (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-07-14 | |||
27 | Justin Puphal (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-12-19 | |||
27 | Lucio Saric (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
29 | Sammy Mohammad (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Dino Klapija (from 2024-02-01) (until 2024-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2023-09-01 14:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |