Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Bauer (until 2024-06-30) | 1982-10-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Juri Kirchmayr (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-11-12 | |||
12 | Benedikt Börner (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
27 | Kevin Lebersorger (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-09 | |||
39 | Anders Rönne Börset (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marces-Lion Amaniampong (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Ole Alsleben (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Lennox Anlauf (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Melvin Berkemer (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-04 | ||||
Ole Brammer (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Dennis Celik (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-29 | ||||
Yasin Chebil (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Danny Connolly (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Erkan Cetin (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Serkan Cetin (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Alessandro Crimaldi (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Taylan Atik Dilerim (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Elia Dittrich (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Jonah Funk (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Michele Gianchino (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Max Greger (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Max Herrewig (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Nilay-Emilio Hermann (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Nils Hoffmann (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-05-25 | ||||
Tyrese Igwesi (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Mateusz Jasinski (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-30 | ||||
Michael John (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Maurice Karp (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Max Kleinschmidt (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Luca Logiewa (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Finn-Marco Lux (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Mario Mbassi (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Kristers Millers (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Benjamin Mommertz (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Adrian Nikischin (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Amar Numic (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Laurin Peters (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Melvin Poms (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-11-09 | ||||
Luca Putaro (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Tim Reuper (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Leonardo Randazzo (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
William Seel (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Karlo Simic (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Mirza Sloboda (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Spyridon Souliotis (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Darwin Soylu (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Carl-Anton Sticherling (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Julius Teuber (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Keno Werner (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Marvin Wiese (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Jamal Jonischkeit (until 2024-04-10) | |||||
2 | Manuel Braun (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-10 | |||
3 | Christian Östergaard (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-13 | |||
4 | Jan Bürger (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
5 | Till Neininger (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
5 | David Odogu (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-06-03 | |||
6 | Kofi Jeremy Amoako (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-05-06 | |||
7 | David Leal Costa (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-24 | |||
8 | Jesse Costa (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-28 | |||
9 | Alexander Georgiadi (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-05-20 | |||
10 | Bennit Bröger (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-07-01 | |||
11 | Max Herrmann (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-06-18 | |||
12 | Kyrylo Khadasevych (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
13 | Pharell Hensel (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
14 | Leonard Köhler (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
15 | Oskar Prokopp (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-01-15 | |||
17 | Elijas Aslanidis (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-10 | |||
18 | Dzenan Pejcinovic (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-15 | |||
19 | Nilas Yacobi (from 2024-05-01) (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
19 | Trevor Benedict (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
20 | Eryk Grzywacz (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-03-14 | |||
22 | Adrian Doci (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-01-01 | |||
24 | Jonathan Akaegbobi (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-04-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-09-03 13:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-10-07 12:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-12-16 11:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |