Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Adolf Hutter (until 2021-06-30) | 1970-02-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Christian Peintinger (until 2021-06-30) | 1967-04-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Trapp (from 2019-08-07) | 1990-07-08 | |||
29 | Felix Wiedwald (until 2020-10-05) | 1990-03-15 | |||
32 | Frederik Ronnow (until 2020-09-30) | 1992-08-04 | |||
37 | Jan Zimmermann (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Deji Beyreuther (until 2019-07-05) | 1999-09-06 | ||||
2 | Obite Evan N'Dicka (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-20 | |||
3 | Simon Falette (until 2020-01-08) | 1992-02-19 | |||
13 | Martin Hinteregger (from 2019-08-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-09-07 | |||
15 | Jetro Willems (until 2019-08-02) | 1994-03-30 | |||
18 | Almamy Toure (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-28 | |||
19 | David Abraham (until 2021-01-17) | 1986-07-16 | |||
23 | Marco Russ (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
24 | Danny da Costa (until 2021-01-21) | 1993-07-13 | |||
25 | Erik Durm (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-05-12 | |||
31 | Fynn Otto (from 2020-01-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 2002-03-08 | |||
33 | Taleb Tawatha (until 2019-08-28) | 1992-06-21 | |||
35 | Tuta (until 2019-08-05) | 1999-07-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Stefan Ilsanker (from 2020-01-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-05-18 | |||
5 | Gelson Fernandes (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-09-02 | |||
6 | Jonathan de Guzman (until 2020-08-31) | 1987-09-13 | |||
10 | Filip Kostic (until 2022-08-11) | 1992-11-01 | |||
11 | Mijat Gacinovic (until 2020-08-04) | 1995-02-08 | |||
16 | Lucas Torro (until 2020-08-04) | 1994-07-19 | |||
17 | Sebastian Rode (from 2019-07-27) (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | |||
20 | Makoto Hasebe (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
21 | Marc Stendera (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-12-10 | |||
22 | Timothy Chandler | 1990-03-29 | |||
26 | Nils Stendera (until 2020-09-09) | 2000-09-30 | |||
28 | Dominik Kohr (until 2021-01-17) | 1994-01-31 | |||
30 | Sahverdi Cetin (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-09-28 | |||
38 | Patrick Finger (until 2020-06-30) | 2001-01-01 | |||
40 | Daichi Kamada (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-08-05 | |||
42 | Marijan Cavar (until 2021-01-13) | 1998-02-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Ante Rebic (until 2019-09-02) | 1993-09-21 | |||
7 | Dejan Joveljic (until 2020-01-31) | 1999-08-07 | |||
9 | Bas Dost (from 2019-08-26) (until 2020-12-31) | 1989-05-31 | |||
27 | Nicolai Muller (until 2019-10-15) | 1987-09-25 | |||
33 | Andre Silva (from 2019-09-02) (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-11-06 | |||
39 | Goncalo Paciencia (until 2020-09-15) | 1994-08-01 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Ante Rebic (from 2019-09-02) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-09-21 | ||||
Dejan Joveljic (from 2020-01-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-08-07 | ||||
Aymen Barkok (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | ||||
Rodrigo Zalazar Martínez (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-12 | ||||
Jetro Willems (from 2019-08-02) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-03-30 | ||||
Tuta (from 2019-08-06) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-07-04 | ||||
Simon Falette (from 2020-01-08) (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-02-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2019-09-19 18:55 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2019-10-03 21:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2019-10-24 21:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2019-11-07 18:55 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2019-11-28 21:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2019-12-12 18:55 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2020-02-20 18:55 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2020-02-28 18:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2020-03-12 18:55 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2020-08-06 21:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |