Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Walter Fritzsch (until 1978-06-30) | 1920-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Prautzsch (until 1978-06-30) | 1941-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Claus Boden (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-10-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dixie Dorner (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-01-25 | ||||
Udo Schmuck (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-10-29 | ||||
Christian Helm (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-01-06 | ||||
Matthias Muller (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-10-18 | ||||
Klaus Muller (until 1980-02-28) | 1953-01-26 | ||||
Frank Ganzera (until 1976-06-30) | 1942-09-08 | ||||
Siegmar Watzlich (until 1975-12-31) | 1947-11-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Reinhard Hafner (until 1988-06-30) | 1952-02-02 | ||||
Hartmut Schade (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-11-13 | ||||
Gerd Weber (until 1981-01-24) | 1956-05-31 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Kreische (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-07-19 | ||||
Claus Lichtenberger (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-04-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gert Heidler (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-01-30 | ||||
Peter Kotte (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-12-08 | ||||
Dieter Riedel (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-09-16 | ||||
Frank Richter (until 1980-10-04) | 1952-01-05 | ||||
Rainer Sachse (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-06-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1975-09-17 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-10-01 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-10-22 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-11-05 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-11-26 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1975-12-10 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1976-03-03 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1976-03-17 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |