Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (until 1979-06-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerhard Heinze (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Schreiner (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-04-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Peter Fenten (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Norbert Dronia (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Werner Buttgereit (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-06-15 | ||||
Ditmar Jakobs (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-28 | ||||
Kees Bregman (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-08-08 | ||||
Michael Brocker (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-09-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Dubski (from 1978-09-06) (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-19 | ||||
Pascal Notthoff (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-27 | ||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Norbert Fruck (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-28 | ||||
Kurt Jara (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-14 | ||||
Norbert Lenzen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-11-23 | ||||
Reiner Alhaus (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-12-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudolf Seliger (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-09-20 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Jurgen Ulitzka (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-11-22 | ||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Gunter Weber (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-07-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1978-09-13 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-09-27 00:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-10-18 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-11-01 00:00 |
3 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-11-22 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-12-06 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1979-03-07 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1979-03-21 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1979-04-10 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1979-04-24 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |