Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1995-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Klaus Funk (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-02-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Jonny Otten (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-01-31 | ||||
Bruno Pezzey (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-02-03 | ||||
Rigobert Gruber (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-05-14 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Klaus Fichtel (until 1984-06-30) | 1944-11-19 | ||||
Matthias Rulander (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-08-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gunter Hermann (until 1992-11-30) | 1960-12-05 | ||||
Norbert Meier (until 1989-12-31) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 1987-10-04) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Wolfgang Sidka (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Norbert Siegmann (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-05-20 | ||||
Uwe Bracht (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-07-10 | ||||
Yasuhiko Okudera (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-12 | ||||
Lothar Bohm (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-02-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Neubarth (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-07-29 | ||||
Frank Ordenewitz (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-03-25 | ||||
Rudi Voller (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Michael Bohnke (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-12-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1983-09-14 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1983-09-28 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1983-10-19 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1983-11-02 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |