Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Hans-Ulrich Grapenthin (until 1989-06-30) | 1943-09-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Lothar Kurbjuweit (until 1989-09-15) | 1950-11-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Werner (until 1988-06-30) | 1942-03-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Perry Brautigam (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-03-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jens-Uwe Penzel (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-11-14 | ||||
Thomas Ludwig (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-06-21 | ||||
Heiko Peschke (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-18 | ||||
Michael Stolz (until 1990-12-31) | 1966-10-19 | ||||
Ronald Szepanski (until 1989-09-10) | 1966-05-16 | ||||
Gert Brauer (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-09-07 | ||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (until 1986-12-31) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Jurgen Koberlein (until 1986-11-30) | 1958-11-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mario Roser (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Olaf Holetschek (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | ||||
Jurgen Raab (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-12-20 | ||||
Stefan Meixner (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-10-13 | ||||
Stefan Boger (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Mathias Pittelkow (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-12-31 | ||||
Andreas Krause (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Schilling (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-03-18 | ||||
Bernd Lindrath (from 1987-01-01) (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-09-13 | ||||
Jorg Burow (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-03-30 | ||||
Thomas Schmiecher (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-04-15 | ||||
Peter Kunzmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-09-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Henry Lesser (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-05-08 | ||||
Robert Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-21 | ||||
Andreas Bielau (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-11-21 | ||||
Karsten Winkel (until 1986-12-31) | 1961-10-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1986-09-17 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-10-01 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |