Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1988-06-30) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Lothar Huber (until 1992-06-30) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Rolf Meyer (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Kutowski (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-02 | ||||
Thomas Helmer (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | ||||
Bernd Storck (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Torsten Wohlert (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-12-10 | ||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Lusch (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-06-16 | ||||
Michael Zorc (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | ||||
Murdo MacLeod (until 1990-10-10) | 1958-09-24 | ||||
Andreas Moller (from 1988-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | ||||
Frank Pagelsdorf (until 1988-12-31) | 1958-02-05 | ||||
Adrian Spyrka (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-08-01 | ||||
Marcel Raducanu (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-10-21 | ||||
Ingo Anderbrugge (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Thorsten Fink (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Mill (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-07-23 | ||||
Norbert Dickel (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-11-27 | ||||
Daniel Simmes (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-08-12 | ||||
Maurice Banach (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-10-09 | ||||
Rupert Gerl (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-08-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1987-09-16 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-09-30 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-10-21 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-11-04 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-11-25 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-12-09 00:00 |
5 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |