Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bodo Illgner (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-04-07 | ||||
Rudi Kargus (until 1990-06-30) | 1952-08-15 | ||||
Michael Kraft (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jann Jensen (until 1992-12-31) | 1969-02-22 | ||||
Paul Steiner (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-01-23 | ||||
Andreas Gielchen (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
Jurgen Kohler (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | ||||
Dieter Prestin (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-08-23 | ||||
Mathias Honerbach (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-04-13 | ||||
Morten Olsen (until 1989-06-30) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Andreas Keim (until 1988-11-14) | 1962-06-08 | ||||
3 | Karsten Baumann (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Horst Heldt (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | ||||
Frank Greiner (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Pierre Littbarski (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-04-16 | ||||
Falko Gotz (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Thomas Hassler (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | ||||
Armin Gortz (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-08-30 | ||||
Stephan Engels (until 1988-12-31) | 1960-09-06 | ||||
Gunter Schlipper (until 1988-12-31) | 1962-08-13 | ||||
6 | Olaf Janssen (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Sturm (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Uwe Rahn (from 1988-11-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-05-21 | ||||
Flemming Povlsen (until 1989-08-15) | 1966-12-03 | ||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-11-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1988-09-07 00:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-10-12 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-10-26 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-11-09 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-11-23 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-12-07 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |