Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1990-04-09) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1990-04-09) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Kurt Kowarz (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-04-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jorg Dittwar (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-08-01 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Uli Bayerschmidt (from 1989-01-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | ||||
Ulf Metschies (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-22 | ||||
Dieter Osswald (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-08-23 | ||||
Stefan Kuhn (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | ||||
Anders Giske (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-11-22 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Heidenreich (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marc Oechler (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | ||||
Joachim Philipkowski (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Martin Wagner (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-02-24 | ||||
Thomas Brunner (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | ||||
Christian Hausmann (from 1989-01-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-11-21 | ||||
Martin Schneider (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-11-24 | ||||
Aleksandar Abutovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-08-09 | ||||
Christian Korek (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-06-16 | ||||
Thomas Kristl (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Brunner (until 1989-12-31) | 1965-02-02 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Dirk Otten (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-01-22 | ||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1988-12-31) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Reiner Wirsching (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-18 | ||||
Frank Turr (until 1991-06-30) | 1970-09-16 | ||||
Souleyman Sane (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-02-26 | ||||
Rudolf Stenzel (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-06-21 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (until 1988-10-10) | 1964-03-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1988-09-07 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-10-05 00:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |