Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Rutemoller (until 1991-08-30) | 1945-02-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1991-08-31) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bodo Illgner (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-04-07 | ||||
Volker Diergardt (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-04-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Alfons Higl (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-12-17 | ||||
Jann Jensen (until 1992-12-31) | 1969-02-22 | ||||
Anders Giske (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-11-22 | ||||
Paul Steiner (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-01-23 | ||||
Andreas Gielchen (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
3 | Karsten Baumann (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Horst Heldt (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | ||||
Frank Greiner (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Pierre Littbarski (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-04-16 | ||||
Hansi Flick (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-02-24 | ||||
Reinhold Daschner (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-10-16 | ||||
Falko Gotz (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Andrzej Rudy (until 1991-12-31) | 1965-10-15 | ||||
Axel Britz (until 1991-06-30) | 1969-01-16 | ||||
Franz Wunderlich (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-10-11 | ||||
6 | Olaf Janssen (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | |||
14 | Henrik Andersen (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-05-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Sturm (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Frank Ordenewitz (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-25 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Maurice Banach (until 1991-11-17) | 1967-10-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1990-09-18 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1990-10-02 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-10-24 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-11-07 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-11-28 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1990-12-12 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |