Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Morten Olsen (from 1993-04-29) (until 1995-08-27) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Wolfgang Jerat (from 1993-02-28) (until 1993-04-28) | 1955-02-09 | ||||
Jorg Berger (until 1993-02-28) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1993-02-28) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Alexander Bade (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-08-25 | ||||
Bodo Illgner (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-04-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Alfons Higl (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-12-17 | ||||
Kim Christofte (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-08-24 | ||||
Carsten Keuler (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-08-30 | ||||
Andre Trulsen (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Roger Nilsen (from 1992-11-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-08-08 | ||||
Jann Jensen (until 1992-12-31) | 1969-02-22 | ||||
3 | Karsten Baumann (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Horst Heldt (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | ||||
Frank Greiner (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Andrzej Rudy (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-10-15 | ||||
Andrzej Kobylanski (from 1993-01-01) (until 1993-10-15) | 1970-07-31 | ||||
Adrian Spyrka (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-08-01 | ||||
Pierre Littbarski (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-04-16 | ||||
Hansi Flick (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-02-24 | ||||
Mahmut Caliskan (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-01-25 | ||||
5 | Patrick Weiser (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-12-25 | |||
6 | Olaf Janssen (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | |||
8 | Rico Steinmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-12-26 | |||
14 | Henrik Andersen (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-05-07 | |||
19 | Pablo Thiam (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Sturm (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Dirk Lehmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-08-16 | ||||
Henri Fuchs (until 1993-12-31) | 1970-06-23 | ||||
Frank Ordenewitz (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-25 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-07-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1992-09-15 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1992-09-30 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |