Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Schehr (from 1997-05-19) (until 1997-06-30) | 1953-10-28 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 1997-05-18) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Rolff (from 1997-03-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Richard Golz (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-06-05 | |||
16 | Holger Hiemann (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Stephane Henchoz (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-09-07 | |||
3 | Matthias Rose (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-12-24 | |||
4 | Jakob Friis-Hansen (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-03-06 | |||
5 | Stefan Schnoor (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-04-18 | |||
15 | Pawel Wojtala (from 1997-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-10-27 | |||
15 | Petar Chubtschew (until 1996-11-30) | 1964-02-26 | |||
23 | Marko Riegel (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-09-04 | |||
24 | Marijan Kovacevic (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-08-31 | |||
29 | Marko Kuck (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-09-14 | |||
31 | Sven Wittfot (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-11-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tibor Nadj (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-12-24 | ||||
Stefan Siedschlag (until 1996-07-31) | 1977-06-08 | ||||
6 | Jurgen Hartmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-10-27 | |||
7 | Sven Kmetsch (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | |||
10 | Tobias Homp (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-10-31 | |||
10 | Markus Schupp (until 1997-03-31) | 1966-01-07 | |||
11 | Hasan Salihamidzic (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-01-01 | |||
13 | Andreas Fischer (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-10-20 | |||
18 | Markus Schopp (until 1997-12-31) | 1974-02-22 | |||
19 | Jochen Seitz (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-10-11 | |||
20 | Bernd Hollerbach (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | |||
21 | Harald Sporl (until 2000-12-06) | 1966-10-31 | |||
22 | Jens Dowe (until 1996-09-15) | 1968-06-01 | |||
27 | Rodolfo Cardoso (from 1996-10-08) (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-10-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Valdas Ivanauskas (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-07-31 | |||
9 | Karsten Baron (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-04-24 | |||
12 | Andre Breitenreiter (until 1997-12-31) | 1973-10-02 | |||
14 | Uwe Jahnig (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-08-26 | |||
17 | Michael Mason (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-06-28 | |||
22 | Marek Saganowski (from 1997-03-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1978-10-31 | |||
30 | Dirk Weetendorf (until 1998-12-31) | 1972-10-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1996-09-10 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-09-24 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-10-15 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-10-29 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-11-19 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1996-12-03 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |