Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Claus Boden (until 2004-06-30) | 1951-10-07 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Werner Lorant (until 2001-10-18) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Pacult (until 2001-10-18) | 1959-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Meier (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
12 | Daniel Hoffmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-10-27 | |||
25 | Michael Hofmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Fach (until 1997-12-31) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
2 | Jochen Kientz (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-09-17 | |||
3 | Ned Zelic (from 1998-01-01) (until 2002-01-23) | 1971-07-04 | |||
4 | Marco Walker (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
5 | Rayk Schroder (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-12-25 | |||
15 | Holger Greilich (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-07-12 | |||
22 | Matthias Hamann (until 1997-09-30) | 1968-02-10 | |||
29 | Guido Gorges (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-06-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tom Stohn (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
6 | Andre Hofschneider (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-06-10 | |||
7 | Horst Heldt (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
8 | Besnik Hasi (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-12-25 | |||
10 | Abderrahim Ouakili (from 1997-12-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-12-12 | |||
10 | Piotr Nowak (until 1997-12-31) | 1964-07-05 | |||
13 | Harald Cerny (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-09-13 | |||
16 | Jens Jeremies (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-03-05 | |||
17 | Daniel Borimirow (until 2004-01-07) | 1970-01-15 | |||
19 | Abedi Pele (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-11-05 | |||
20 | Miroslav Stevic (until 1998-12-31) | 1970-01-07 | |||
23 | Jorg Bohme (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-01-22 | |||
24 | Stefan Malz (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-06-15 | |||
33 | Manfred Bender (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Olaf Bodden (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-05-04 | |||
11 | Bernhard Winkler (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-06-24 | |||
18 | Paul Agostino (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-06-09 | |||
23 | Christo Jowow (from 1998-01-01) (until 1998-12-31) | 1977-11-04 | |||
34 | Bernd Hobsch (from 1998-01-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-05-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1997-09-16 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1997-09-30 00:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-10-22 18:15 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1997-11-04 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |