Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 2005-12-31) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 2013-05-14) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frank Rost (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-06-30 | |||
12 | Stefan Brasas (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | |||
16 | Pascal Borel (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-09-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
6 | Frank Baumann (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
8 | Bernhard Trares (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-08-18 | |||
11 | Jacek Chanko (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-01-25 | |||
13 | Andree Wiedener (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-03-14 | |||
19 | Viktor Skripnik (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-11-19 | |||
24 | Sven Benken (until 1999-07-18) | 1970-04-20 | |||
28 | Razundara Tjikuzu (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-12-12 | |||
30 | Pawel Wojtala (until 1999-12-31) | 1972-10-27 | |||
36 | Julio Cesar (until 2000-06-30) | 1963-03-08 | |||
38 | Bjorn Schierenbeck (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-07-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Lodewijk Roembiak (until 2000-03-04) | 1969-05-18 | |||
3 | Raphael Wicky (until 2000-12-31) | 1977-04-26 | |||
4 | Dirk Flock (until 2000-09-30) | 1972-05-23 | |||
5 | Dieter Eilts (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-12-13 | |||
7 | Juri Maksimow (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-12-08 | |||
15 | Dieter Frey (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-10-31 | |||
17 | Marco Bode (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-07-23 | |||
18 | Andreas Herzog (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-09-10 | |||
21 | Uwe Harttgen (until 1999-12-31) | 1964-07-06 | |||
22 | Torsten Frings (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-11-22 | |||
23 | Christoph Dabrowski (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | |||
26 | Timo Schultz (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | |||
33 | Mike Barten (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-11-20 | |||
35 | Paul Stalteri (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
39 | Danny Futterer (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-08-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Adrian Kunz (from 1999-07-17) (until 1999-07-17) | 1967-07-07 | ||||
9 | Rade Bogdanovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-05-21 | |||
10 | Claudio Pizarro (from 1999-08-16) (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
25 | Soren Seidel (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-10 | |||
32 | Ailton (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-07-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1999-09-16 00:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1999-09-30 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1999-10-21 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1999-11-04 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1999-11-25 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-12-07 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2000-02-29 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-03-09 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-03-16 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-03-23 00:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |