Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jochen Rucker (until 2005-06-30) | 1944-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Felix Magath (from 2001-02-24) (until 2004-06-30) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 2001-02-23) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Timo Hildebrand (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
24 | Thomas Ernst (from 2001-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-12-23 | |||
25 | Ales Chvalovsky (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-05-29 | |||
28 | Eberhard Trautner (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Stefan Blank (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-03-10 | |||
4 | Rui Rui Marques (from 2001-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-09-03 | |||
4 | Thomas Berthold (until 2001-01-16) | 1964-11-12 | |||
5 | Bordon (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-01-07 | |||
14 | Thomas Schneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
21 | Jochen Endress (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
25 | Fabio Morena (from 2000-11-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-03-19 | |||
26 | Andreas Hinkel (until 2001-06-30) | 1982-03-26 | |||
27 | Timo Wenzel (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-11-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Pablo Thiam (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | |||
7 | Silvio Meissner (until 2006-12-20) | 1973-01-19 | |||
7 | Kristijan Dordevic (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
8 | Jens Todt (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-01-05 | |||
10 | Krassimir Balakow (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-03-29 | |||
12 | Heiko Gerber (until 2007-06-30) | 1972-07-11 | |||
13 | Christian Tiffert (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-02-18 | |||
15 | Alexander Hleb (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-05-01 | |||
16 | Bradley Carnell (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-01-21 | |||
17 | Jochen Seitz (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-10-11 | |||
18 | Giuseppe Catizone (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-07-20 | |||
20 | Zvonimir Soldo (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-11-02 | |||
22 | Krisztian Lisztes (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-07-02 | |||
32 | Rudiger Kauf (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-03-01 | |||
33 | Roberto Pinto (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-08-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Pavel Kuka (until 2000-08-31) | 1968-07-19 | |||
11 | Ioan Ganea (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-08-10 | |||
19 | Adhemar (from 2001-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
23 | Ahmed Hosny (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-07-11 | |||
35 | Ioannis Amanatidis (until 2000-12-31) | 1981-12-03 | |||
36 | Sean Dundee (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-12-07 | |||
44 | Angelo Vaccaro (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-10-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2000-09-14 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-09-28 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-10-26 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-11-09 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2000-11-23 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2000-12-05 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2001-02-15 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2001-02-22 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |