Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Enver Maric (until 2010-06-30) | 1948-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Falko Gotz (from 2002-02-06) (until 2002-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 2002-02-06) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Bernd Storck (until 2002-02-06) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gabor Kiraly (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-04-01 | |||
12 | Christian Fiedler (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | |||
40 | Tomasz Kuszczak (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-03-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Kostas Konstantinidis (from 2002-05-12) (until 2002-09-30) | 1972-08-31 | ||||
2 | Denis Lapaczinski (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-09-26 | |||
4 | Dick van Burik (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-29 | |||
5 | Kostas Konstantinidis (until 2002-03-13) | 1972-08-31 | |||
6 | Eyjolfur Sverrisson (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-08-03 | |||
14 | Josip Simunic (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-02-18 | |||
33 | Marko Rehmer (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-04-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Bart Goor (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-04-09 | |||
16 | Roberto Pinto (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-08-22 | |||
18 | Pal Dardai (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | |||
19 | Andreas Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
20 | Andreas Neuendorf (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
21 | Michael Hartmann (until 2005-01-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
22 | Stefan Beinlich (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-01-13 | |||
23 | Rene Tretschok (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-12-23 | |||
25 | Rob Maas (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
26 | Sebastian Deisler (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-01-05 | |||
28 | Nderim Nedzipi (until 2003-06-30) | 1984-05-22 | |||
30 | Marcelinho (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-05-17 | |||
32 | Thorben Marx (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-06-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Alex Alves (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-12-30 | |||
9 | Ali Daei (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-03-21 | |||
11 | Michael Preetz (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | |||
17 | Sead Zilic (until 2002-11-06) | 1982-09-17 | |||
24 | Trond Ludvigsen (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-06-22 | |||
44 | Joel Tchami (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-03-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2001-09-19 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-09-25 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-10-16 17:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2001-11-01 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2001-11-22 18:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2001-12-06 18:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |