Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Oliver Reck (until 2005-12-11) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 2004-09-15) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Eddy Achterberg (until 2004-09-15) | 1947-02-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frank Rost (until 2007-01-04) | 1973-06-30 | |||
27 | Oliver Reck (until 2004-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | |||
29 | Volkan Unlu (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-07-08 | |||
33 | Christofer Heimeroth (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-08-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Nico Van Kerckhoven (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-12-14 | |||
3 | Anibal Matellan (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-05-08 | |||
4 | Dario Rodriguez (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-09-17 | |||
6 | Tomasz Hajto (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-16 | |||
12 | Marco van Hoogdalem (until 2004-01-26) | 1972-05-23 | |||
13 | Alcides (until 2003-12-23) | 1985-03-13 | |||
15 | Tomasz Waldoch (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-05-10 | |||
28 | Fabian Lamotte (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-25 | |||
37 | Christian Pander (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-08-28 | |||
39 | Thomas Klasener (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-08-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sven Kmetsch (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | |||
7 | Lewan Kobiaschwili (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-07-10 | |||
8 | Jorg Bohme (until 2004-12-31) | 1974-01-22 | |||
9 | Hamit Altintop (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-12-08 | |||
10 | Gustavo Varela (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-05-14 | |||
16 | Kristijan Dordevic (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
17 | Sven Vermant (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-04-04 | |||
18 | Niels Oude Kamphuis (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-11-14 | |||
20 | Christian Poulsen (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-02-28 | |||
23 | Jochen Seitz (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-10-11 | |||
24 | Simon Cziommer (until 2004-01-31) | 1980-11-06 | |||
31 | Sergio da Silva Pinto (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-10-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
11 | Ebbe Sand (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-07-19 | |||
14 | Gerald Asamoah (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
19 | Edi Glieder (from 2003-09-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-01-28 | |||
21 | Emile Mpenza (until 2003-08-28) | 1978-07-04 | |||
22 | Victor Agali (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-12-29 | |||
26 | Mike Hanke (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-05 | |||
34 | Michael Delura (until 2004-06-30) | 1985-07-01 | |||
35 | Filip Trojan (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2003-09-25 17:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2003-10-16 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2003-11-06 18:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2003-11-27 18:15 |
3 : 1 PSO |
Schema Compare |