Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Enver Maric (until 2010-06-30) | 1948-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Hans Meyer (from 2003-12-22) (until 2004-06-30) | 1942-11-03 | ||||
Andreas Thom (from 2003-12-04) (until 2003-12-21) | 1965-09-07 | ||||
Huub Stevens (until 2003-12-03) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Andreas Thom (from 2003-12-22) (until 2007-04-10) | 1965-09-07 | ||||
Holger Gehrke (until 2003-12-03) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gabor Kiraly (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-04-01 | |||
12 | Christian Fiedler (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | |||
40 | Tomasz Kuszczak (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-03-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Arne Friedrich (until 2010-06-30) | 1979-05-29 | |||
4 | Dick van Burik (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-29 | |||
14 | Josip Simunic (until 2009-06-30) | 1978-02-18 | |||
17 | Alexander Madlung (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-07-11 | |||
22 | Denis Lapaczinski (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-09-26 | |||
23 | Dennis Cagara (from 2004-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-02-19 | |||
29 | Malik Fathi (until 2008-03-11) | 1983-10-29 | |||
33 | Marko Rehmer (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-04-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Niko Kovac (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | |||
8 | Bart Goor (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-04-09 | |||
10 | Marcelinho (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-05-17 | |||
13 | Bartosz Karwan (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-01-13 | |||
16 | Roberto Pinto (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-08-22 | |||
18 | Pal Dardai (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | |||
19 | Andreas Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
20 | Andreas Neuendorf (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
21 | Michael Hartmann (until 2005-01-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
25 | Alexander Ludwig (until 2005-08-12) | 1984-01-31 | |||
27 | Alexander Mladenow (until 2004-08-31) | 1982-06-25 | |||
28 | Sofian Chahed (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-04-18 | |||
32 | Thorben Marx (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-06-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Luizao (until 2004-03-07) | 1975-11-14 | |||
11 | Artur Wichniarek (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-02-28 | |||
13 | Fredi Bobic (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-10-30 | |||
15 | Giuseppe Reina (from 2004-02-03) (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-04-15 | |||
24 | Nando Rafael (until 2006-01-31) | 1984-01-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2003-09-24 17:30 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2003-10-15 17:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |