Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Claus Reitmaier (until 2010-06-30) | 1964-03-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Huub Stevens (until 2008-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Schupp (until 2008-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frank Rost (until 2011-06-30) | 1973-06-30 | |||
12 | Wolfgang Hesl (until 2010-08-30) | 1986-01-13 | |||
29 | Raphael Wolf (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-06-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Juan Sorin (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-05-05 | |||
3 | Thimothee Atouba (until 2009-06-30) | 1982-02-17 | |||
4 | Bastian Reinhardt (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-11-19 | |||
5 | Joris Mathijsen (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-04-05 | |||
6 | Vadis Odjidja-Ofoe (from 2008-01-01) (until 2009-01-08) | 1989-02-21 | |||
10 | Vincent Kompany (until 2008-08-20) | 1986-04-10 | |||
19 | Jerome Boateng (from 2007-08-21) (until 2009-06-30) | 1988-09-03 | |||
20 | Guy Demel (until 2011-08-30) | 1981-06-13 | |||
21 | Sebastian Langkamp (until 2008-01-29) | 1988-01-15 | |||
24 | Miso Brecko (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-05-01 | |||
30 | Collin Benjamin (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Raphael Wicky (until 2007-08-22) | 1977-04-26 | |||
8 | Nigel de Jong (until 2009-01-20) | 1984-11-30 | |||
13 | Mario Fillinger (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-10-10 | |||
14 | David Jarolim (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
15 | Piotr Trochowski (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-03-22 | |||
16 | Anton Putsila (from 2008-01-01) (until 2008-12-31) | 1987-06-10 | |||
18 | Romeo Castelen (from 2007-07-30) (until 2012-06-30) | 1983-05-03 | |||
23 | Rafael van der Vaart (until 2008-08-03) | 1983-02-11 | |||
25 | Kosi Saka (until 2008-01-29) | 1986-02-04 | |||
27 | Alexander Laas (until 2007-07-22) | 1984-05-05 | |||
28 | Otto Addo (until 2008-06-30) | 1975-06-09 | |||
31 | Timo Kunert (from 2007-08-09) (until 2009-06-30) | 1987-03-12 | |||
32 | Anis Ben-Hatira (until 2009-01-31) | 1988-07-18 | |||
33 | Benny Feilhaber (until 2007-08-14) | 1985-01-19 | |||
34 | Sidney Sam (until 2008-08-18) | 1988-01-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Mohamed Zidan (until 2008-08-14) | 1981-12-11 | |||
9 | Paolo Guerrero (until 2012-06-30) | 1984-01-01 | |||
11 | Ivica Olic (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-09-14 | |||
16 | Mustafa Kucukovic (until 2007-08-20) | 1986-11-05 | |||
17 | Macauley Chrisantus (from 2007-11-13) (until 2009-06-30) | 1990-08-20 | |||
17 | Boubacar Sanogo (until 2007-07-23) | 1982-12-17 | |||
22 | Eric Maxim Choupo-Moting (until 2009-08-31) | 1989-03-23 | |||
35 | Tunay Torun (from 2008-04-21) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-04-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2007-09-18 18:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2007-10-04 18:15 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2007-10-25 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2007-11-29 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2007-12-05 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2007-12-20 20:45 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2008-02-14 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2008-02-21 17:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2008-03-06 21:05 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2008-03-12 17:45 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |