Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Rudiger Vollborn (until 2012-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 2011-06-30) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rene Adler (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
22 | Benedikt Fernandez (until 2011-06-30) | 1985-01-08 | |||
33 | Tomasz Bobel (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-12-29 | |||
36 | Fabian Giefer (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-05-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Daniel Schwaab (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-08-23 | |||
4 | Sami Hyypia (until 2011-06-30) | 1973-10-07 | |||
5 | Manuel Friedrich (until 2013-06-30) | 1979-09-13 | |||
15 | Tobias Haitz (from 2010-10-27) (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-02-12 | |||
15 | Hans Sarpei (until 2010-08-25) | 1976-06-28 | |||
17 | Domagoj Vida (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-04-29 | |||
20 | Danny da Costa (from 2010-12-16) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-07-13 | |||
20 | Lukas Sinkiewicz (until 2010-07-21) | 1985-10-09 | |||
24 | Michal Kadlec (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-12-13 | |||
27 | Gonzalo Castro (until 2012-06-30) | 1987-06-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Stefan Reinartz (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-01-01 | |||
6 | Simon Rolfes (until 2015-06-30) | 1982-01-21 | |||
7 | Tranquillo Barnetta (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-05-22 | |||
8 | Lars Bender (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
10 | Renato Augusto (until 2012-12-31) | 1988-02-08 | |||
13 | Michael Ballack (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | |||
14 | Hanno Balitsch (until 2012-01-07) | 1981-01-02 | |||
18 | Sidney Sam (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-31 | |||
21 | Marcel Risse (until 2010-08-24) | 1989-12-17 | |||
23 | Arturo Vidal (until 2011-07-20) | 1987-05-22 | |||
26 | Kevin Kampl (from 2011-01-01) (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-10-09 | |||
26 | Thanos Petsos (until 2010-08-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
28 | Burak Kaplan (until 2011-01-26) | 1990-02-01 | |||
32 | Julian Riedel (from 2010-10-24) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-08-10 | |||
37 | Kevin Kampl (until 2010-08-29) | 1990-10-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Patrick Helmes (until 2011-01-30) | 1984-03-01 | |||
11 | Stefan Kiessling (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-01-25 | |||
19 | Eren Derdiyok (until 2012-06-30) | 1988-06-12 | |||
29 | Christoph Siefkes (from 2010-08-24) (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-02-20 | |||
31 | Nicolai Jorgensen (until 2011-12-31) | 1991-01-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2010-09-16 19:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2010-09-30 21:05 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2010-10-21 21:05 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2010-11-04 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2010-12-01 21:05 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2010-12-16 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2011-02-17 17:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2011-02-24 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2011-03-10 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2011-03-17 21:05 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |