Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Schmidt (until 2017-05-22) | 1967-04-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jonas Lossl (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-02-01 | |||
22 | Rene Adler (from 2017-06-23) (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | |||
23 | Gianluca Curci (until 2017-01-30) | 1985-07-12 | |||
33 | Jannik Huth (until 2018-01-31) | 1994-04-15 | |||
34 | Lukas Watkowiak (from 2017-01-04) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-03-06 | |||
46 | Florian Muller (from 2017-01-30) (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-11-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Giulio Donati (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-02-05 | |||
3 | Leon Balogun (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-06-28 | |||
7 | Pierre Bengtsson (until 2016-08-29) | 1988-04-12 | |||
13 | Marin Sverko (from 2017-01-17) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-04 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell | 1991-08-24 | |||
16 | Stefan Bell (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | |||
18 | Daniel Brosinski (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-07-17 | |||
22 | Andre Ramalho (from 2016-08-31) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-16 | |||
24 | Gaetan Bussmann (until 2018-01-29) | 1991-02-02 | |||
26 | Niko Bungert (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-10-24 | |||
42 | Alexander Hack (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Niki Zimling (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | ||||
5 | Jose Rodriguez (from 2016-07-31) (until 2017-01-30) | 1994-12-16 | |||
6 | Danny Latza (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-12-07 | |||
8 | Levin Oztunali (from 2016-08-25) (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | |||
10 | Yunus Malli (until 2017-01-04) | 1992-02-24 | |||
17 | Jairo Samperio (until 2018-01-01) | 1993-07-11 | |||
20 | Fabian Frei (until 2017-12-31) | 1989-01-08 | |||
25 | Jean-Philippe Gbamin (from 2016-07-13) (until 2019-08-02) | 1995-09-25 | |||
27 | Christian Clemens (until 2016-12-31) | 1991-08-04 | |||
29 | Devante Parker (until 2017-01-30) | 1996-03-16 | |||
30 | Besar Halimi (until 2018-08-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
30 | Patrick Pflucke (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-11-30 | |||
32 | Pablo de Blasis (until 2018-08-30) | 1988-02-04 | |||
38 | Gerrit Holtmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | |||
45 | Suat Serdar (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
47 | Philipp Klement (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-09-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Maximilian Beister (from 2017-05-31) (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-09-06 | ||||
Maximilian Beister (until 2016-10-18) | 1990-09-06 | ||||
7 | Robin Quaison (from 2017-01-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-10-09 | |||
9 | Yoshinori Muto (until 2018-08-02) | 1992-07-15 | |||
10 | Bojan (from 2017-01-29) (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-08-28 | |||
11 | Emil Berggreen (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-05-10 | |||
15 | Jhon Cordoba (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-11 | |||
21 | Karim Onisiwo (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-17 | |||
36 | Aaron Seydel (from 2016-11-24) (until 2017-08-23) | 1996-02-07 | |||
41 | Mounir Bouziane (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-02-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Todor Nedelew (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-07 | ||||
Florian Niederlechner (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | ||||
Robin Zentner (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-10-28 | ||||
Pierre Bengtsson (from 2016-08-29) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-04-12 | ||||
Jose Rodriguez (from 2017-01-31) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-12-16 | ||||
Maximilian Beister (from 2016-10-18) (until 2017-05-31) | 1990-09-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2016-09-15 19:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2016-09-29 17:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2016-10-20 21:05 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2016-11-03 19:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2016-11-24 21:05 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2016-12-08 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |