Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pal Dardai (until 2019-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dennis Smarsch (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-01-14 | ||||
1 | Thomas Kraft (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-07-22 | |||
22 | Rune Jarstein (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-09-29 | |||
33 | Jonathan Klinsmann (from 2017-07-11) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Peter Pekarik (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-10-30 | |||
4 | Karim Rekik (until 2020-10-04) | 1994-12-02 | |||
5 | Niklas Stark (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-14 | |||
15 | Sebastian Langkamp (until 2018-01-30) | 1988-01-15 | |||
17 | Maximilian Mittelstadt (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-18 | |||
21 | Marvin Plattenhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-26 | |||
23 | Mitchell Weiser (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-04-21 | |||
25 | Jordan Torunarigha (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-07 | |||
29 | Florian Baak (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kevin Sessa | 2000-07-06 | ||||
3 | Per Skjelbred (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-06-16 | |||
6 | Vladimir Darida (until 2022-12-30) | 1990-08-08 | |||
7 | Alexander Esswein (until 2018-12-22) | 1990-03-25 | |||
10 | Ondrej Duda (until 2020-01-12) | 1994-12-15 | |||
11 | Mathew Leckie (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
14 | Valentin Stocker (until 2018-01-10) | 1989-04-12 | |||
18 | Sinan Kurt (until 2019-01-30) | 1996-07-23 | |||
20 | Valentino Lazaro (from 2017-08-03) (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-03-24 | |||
26 | Arne Maier (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-08 | |||
28 | Fabian Lustenberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-05-02 | |||
30 | Julius Kade (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-20 | |||
33 | Arne Maier (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-01-08 | |||
34 | Maurice Covic (from 2018-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-04-17 | |||
35 | Sidney Friede (from 2018-01-31) (until 2019-01-17) | 1998-04-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Salomon Kalou (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-08-05 | |||
16 | Julian Schieber (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-13 | |||
19 | Vedad Ibisevic (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
24 | Genki Haraguchi (until 2018-01-23) | 1991-05-09 | |||
27 | Davie Selke (until 2020-01-31) | 1995-01-20 | |||
32 | Palko Dardai (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-04-24 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Nils Korber (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-11-13 | ||||
Marius Gersbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-06-20 | ||||
Genki Haraguchi (from 2018-01-23) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-05-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2017-09-14 21:05 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-09-28 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-10-19 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-11-02 21:05 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-11-23 19:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-12-07 21:05 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |