Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Wilke (until 1956-06-30) | 1926-11-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Schnoor (until 1969-06-30) | 1934-04-11 | ||||
Werner Schadly (until 1961-06-30) | 1922-06-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerd Krug (until 1966-06-30) | 1936-08-05 | ||||
Jochen Meinke (until 1966-06-30) | 1930-10-23 | ||||
Jurgen Werner (until 1963-06-30) | 1935-04-15 | ||||
Franz Klepacz (until 1961-06-30) | 1926-10-10 | ||||
Jupp Posipal (until 1958-06-30) | 1927-06-20 | ||||
Gunter Schlegel (until 1958-06-30) | 1926-01-10 | ||||
Fritz Laband (until 1956-06-30) | 1925-11-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Seeler (until 1966-06-30) | 1931-12-15 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Liese (until 1958-06-30) | 1923-10-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Seeler (until 1972-06-30) | 1936-11-05 | ||||
Klaus Sturmer (until 1961-10-31) | 1935-08-09 | ||||
Uwe Reuter (until 1960-06-30) | 1934-11-27 | ||||
Rolf Borner (until 1958-06-30) | 1923-07-23 | ||||
Walter Schemel (until 1958-06-30) | 1923-12-01 | ||||
Werner Harden (until 1958-06-30) | 1924-08-11 | ||||
Herbert Wojtkowiak (until 1957-06-30) | 1922-01-11 | ||||
Emil Schildt (until 1956-06-30) | 1930-09-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1956-05-13 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1956-05-20 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1956-05-30 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1956-06-03 00:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1956-06-10 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1956-06-17 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |