Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Oswald Pfau (until 1961-06-30) | 1915-01-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Anton Schumacher (until 1968-06-30) | 1938-12-01 | ||||
Fritz Ewert (until 1966-06-30) | 1937-02-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Fritz Pott (until 1970-06-30) | 1939-04-23 | ||||
Georg Stollenwerk (until 1966-06-30) | 1930-12-19 | ||||
Leo Wilden (until 1966-06-30) | 1936-07-03 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schnellinger (until 1963-06-30) | 1939-03-31 | ||||
Otto Neteler (until 1961-06-30) | 1936-06-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans Sturm (until 1967-06-30) | 1935-09-03 | ||||
Hans Schafer (until 1966-06-30) | 1927-10-19 | ||||
Ernst-Gunter Habig (until 1963-06-30) | 1935-09-14 | ||||
Paul Eich (until 1963-06-30) | 1938-02-23 | ||||
Jurgen Heitmann (until 1963-06-30) | 1935-06-02 | ||||
Manfred Rohrig (until 1963-06-30) | 1938-07-27 | ||||
Christian Breuer (until 1962-06-30) | 1939-04-24 | ||||
Fritz Breuer (until 1961-12-31) | 1929-08-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Thielen (until 1973-06-30) | 1940-04-02 | ||||
Christian Muller (until 1966-06-30) | 1938-08-29 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Ripkens (until 1964-06-30) | 1937-12-09 | ||||
Coskun Tas (until 1961-06-30) | 1935-04-23 | ||||
Dietmar Jost (until 1961-06-30) | 1940-03-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1961-05-20 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1961-05-27 00:00 |
3 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1961-06-03 00:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1961-06-10 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1961-06-14 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1961-06-18 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |