Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Julian Nagelsmann (until 2023-03-24) | 1987-07-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dino Toppmoller (until 2022-06-30) | 1980-11-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ron Thorben Hoffmann (until 2022-08-31) | 1999-04-04 | ||||
1 | Manuel Neuer | 1986-03-27 | |||
26 | Sven Ulreich | 1988-08-03 | |||
36 | Christian Fruchtl (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dayot Upamecano | 1998-10-27 | |||
3 | Omar Richards (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-15 | |||
4 | Niklas Sule (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-09-03 | |||
5 | Benjamin Pavard (until 2023-08-31) | 1996-03-28 | |||
15 | Chris Richards (until 2021-08-31) | 2000-03-28 | |||
19 | Alphonso Davies | 2000-11-02 | |||
20 | Bouna Sarr (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-01-31 | |||
21 | Lucas Hernandez (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-14 | |||
23 | Tanguy Nianzou (until 2022-08-16) | 2002-06-07 | |||
43 | Bright Akwo Arrey-Mbi (until 2022-01-29) | 2003-03-26 | |||
44 | Josip Stanisic (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Taylor Booth (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-05-31 | ||||
Mickael Cuisance (until 2022-01-02) | 1999-08-16 | ||||
6 | Joshua Kimmich | 1995-02-08 | |||
8 | Leon Goretzka | 1995-02-06 | |||
18 | Marcel Sabitzer (from 2021-08-30) (until 2023-01-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
22 | Marc Roca (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-11-26 | |||
24 | Corentin Tolisso (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-08-03 | |||
42 | Jamal Musiala | 2003-02-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Serge Gnabry | 1995-07-14 | |||
9 | Robert Lewandowski (until 2022-07-18) | 1988-08-21 | |||
10 | Leroy Sane | 1996-01-11 | |||
13 | Eric Maxim Choupo-Moting (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-03-23 | |||
17 | Malik Tillman (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-28 | |||
25 | Thomas Muller | 1989-09-13 | |||
29 | Kingsley Coman (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-06-13 | |||
47 | Armindo Sieb (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Alexander Nubel (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-30 | ||||
Lars Lukas Mai (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-31 | ||||
Adrian Fein (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-18 | ||||
Joshua Zirkzee (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-05-22 | ||||
Jann-Fiete Arp (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-06 | ||||
15 | Chris Richards (from 2021-08-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2021-08-17 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |